Docket History
2/15/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-APRIL 12, 2013 @ 10:00AM
5/11/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL
2/24/2012
Order rescheduling Settlement Conference
2/23/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference
2/15/2012
Decision and Judgment
2/7/2012
Amended Magistrate Order
1/27/2012
MAGISTRATE ORDER
12/28/2011
Motion and Notice of Hearing
12/23/2011
Agreed Order
12/15/2011
Notice of change of Plaintiff's address
12/1/2011
Defendant's Motion for modification of Temporary Order for Order allocating marital debt and expenses and for driving restrictions
11/15/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference and Continuing Settlement Conference
11/8/2011
Temporary Order
10/26/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference: On
10/17/2011
Order scheduling Final Hearing
10/13/2011
Order requiring parties to attend "Helping Children Succeed After Divorce" seminar
10/7/2011
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN