Docket History
7/25/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 14, 2013 @ 3:30 PM
5/1/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference/Trial
4/26/2012
REQUEST FOR SHARED PARENTING
3/7/2012
AGREED ORDER
2/21/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
1/27/2012
PRETRIAL ORDER
1/26/2012
MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDER
1/24/2012
Notice of Hearing
1/13/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER
11/28/2011
Order scheduling mediation
10/18/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for exclusive use of the marital residence
10/18/2011
Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for exclusive use of the marital residence
10/4/2011
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM
9/30/2011
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING