Docket History
5/29/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 8-16-13 @11:00 A.M.
3/26/2012
AGREED ORDER DISMISSING MOTION
2/23/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER WITHHOLDING ORDER
2/22/2012
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
2/13/2012
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WITHHOLDING ORDER
2/8/2012
Order Scheduling Trial
1/19/2012
Entry GRANTING Voluntary Dismissal
1/19/2012
Notice of Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal
1/10/2012
Plaintiff's Motion for withholding order
12/15/2011
Order GRANTING Interim atty fees
12/14/2011
Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Atty Fees; Request for Hearing
12/7/2011
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INTERIM ATTORNEY FEES
12/5/2011
Entry and Order setting telephone pre-trial
12/1/2011
Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Withholding Order
11/1/2011
Notice of withdrawal of Request for Oral Hearing on Temporary Orders
10/4/2011
REQUEST FOR ORAL HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS PURSUANT TO CIVIL RULE 75