Docket History
4/17/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 5, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
6/6/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- FEBRUARY 12, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
5/14/2012
Order Scheduling Telephone Pretrial Conference/Trial
5/7/2012
ORDER FOR UPDATE TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT
3/27/2012
NOTICE OF HEARING
2/2/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference/Trial
1/6/2012
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM-RECORDS DEPOSITION
12/29/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/Trial
12/15/2011
Motion for Continuance
12/15/2011
Order GRANTING Continuance; continued to Jan 27, 2012