Case Information
2/6/2013
2010DR01319
Common Pleas
Sean R Richardson
Lynniece D Moore-richardson
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 2, 2013 @ 1:30 PM FOR 1/2 DAY
Cheryl Washington
Docket History
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 2, 2013 @ 1:30 PM FOR 1/2 DAY
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 2, 2013 @ 1:30 PM FOR 1/2 DAY
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 2, 2013 @ 1:30 PM FOR 1/2 DAY
11/7/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- THE TRIAL CONTINUED TO JANUARY 25, 2013 @ 1:30 PM PRE TRIAL ON JANUARY 4, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
11/18/2011
Order Scheduling Trial
11/14/2011
CONTINUANCE ORDER
10/12/2011
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR HEARING
9/30/2011
PRETRIAL STATEMENT