Docket History
12/18/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 2-9-16 @1:30 P.M.
12/18/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 2-9-16 @1:30 P.M.
12/18/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 2-9-16 @1:30 P.M.
7/21/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 09/10/2015 @ 3:30 PM
3/30/2012
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF DIVORCE
3/30/2012
FINAL DECREE OF SHARED PARENTING
3/30/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order Adopting Final Judgment and Decree
2/16/2012
PRETRIAL ORDER
2/6/2012
Order of reference Hearing date set
1/24/2012
Notice of substitution as Counsel of record for Plaintiff and Motion to use Jan 24, 2012 hearing date as settlement conference
1/24/2012
Entry Granting Plaintiff's Motion to use Jan 24, 2012 hearing date as settlement conference
10/19/2011
Agreed Order