Docket History
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 27, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 27, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
2/6/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 27, 2013 @ 9:30 AM
12/11/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 18, 2013 @ 10:00 AM FOR A PRE TRIAL AND JULY 1, 2013 @ 9:30 FOR A FULL DAY STAND ALONE TRIAL
1/18/2012
Order continuing Trial
12/22/2011
Agreed Order
12/21/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for immediate transfer of custody of the minor children
12/19/2011
Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Transfer of Custody of the Minor Children
12/15/2011
Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause
12/15/2011
Order to Show Cause
12/7/2011
ORDER
11/10/2011
Entry & Order Setting Telephone Pre-Trial
11/9/2011
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE
11/2/2011
Entry & Order Setting Telephone Pre-Trial