Docket History
12/10/2019
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-2-4-20 @ 9:00AM
5/8/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MAY 9, 2013 @ 11:00 AM
11/5/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MAY 15, 2013 @ 9:00 AM
4/30/2012
OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION AND PERMANENT ORDER
4/20/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order
4/9/2012
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
3/27/2012
Order Scheduling Trial
1/23/2012
Entry of Continuance
1/10/2012
Notice of potential Dismissal of Motion
11/4/2011
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days
10/12/2011
Decision and Judgment
10/4/2011
MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES