Docket History
9/15/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-12/17/2014 @ 9:00 AM
9/15/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-12/17/2014 @ 9:00 AM
3/14/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MAY 27, 2014 @ 9:00 AM
5/16/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 3, 2013 @ 11:00 AM
2/5/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 9, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
2/5/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- APRIL 9, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
1/30/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- FEB 27, 2013 @ 3:30 PM
5/18/2012
AGREED ORDER
3/5/2012
AGREED ORDER
2/15/2012
Decision and Judgment
2/6/2012
Order to Show Cause
2/2/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION
1/10/2012
Amended Pretrial Order
12/20/2011
Magistrate's Order
11/15/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference and Continuing Trial Date