ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPTEMBER 6, 2013 @ 10:00 AM
1/30/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 1, 2013 @ 10:00 AM
2/7/2012
Order referring case to Family Relations Dept
2/7/2012
Pre-Hearing Order
1/24/2012
Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
1/24/2012
Order and Entry Granting Continuance
1/17/2012
Notice of substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff
12/21/2011
Continuance Order
12/5/2011
Entry & Order appointing counsel
11/30/2011
Amended Motion for Contempt for failing to permit parenting time; Motion for counseling; Motion to terminate spousal support; Motion to transfer custody of child to the Plaintiff; Motion for GAL; Motion for child support, health care and other orders; Mot