ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION FILED ON MARCH 19, 2013 PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 18, 2013 TO FILE HER RESPONSE
Keith Kearney
Docket History
9/27/2013
MOTION & ENTRY FOR CONTINUANCE HEARING CONTINUED TO NOV 14, 2013 @ 10:00 AM (2 HOURS)
9/17/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 22, 2013 @ 10:00 AM FOR 2 HOURS
NUNC PRO TUNC MOTION & ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRANSCRIPT. THE COURT REPORTERS ARE GRANTED AND ADDITIONAL 40 DAYS IN WHICH TO TILE THE TRANSCRIPTS IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE, SAID TRANSCRIPTS ARE TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 26,