Case Information
9/25/2013
2008DR01244
Common Pleas
Pamela R Neal-monie (neal)
Matthew Monie Jr
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- DECEMBER 5, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
Trisha Duff
Docket History
7/23/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPTEMBER 13, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
5/21/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-6-24-13 @ 3:30PM
5/24/2012
AGREED ORDER
3/26/2012
AGREED ORDER
3/16/2012
NOTICE OF NONAPPROVAL OF DIVISION OF PROPERTY ORDER
2/9/2012
Entry Granting Continuance
10/25/2011
Entry & Order Appointing Counsel