Case Information
8/1/2013
2008DR00816
Common Pleas
Stacey A Henry
Selena M Henry (aka Romine)
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOVEMBER 7, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
Eugene Robinson
Docket History
9/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 16, 2013 FOR 1/2 DAY
6/22/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 @ 9:00 AM UNTIL 3:30 PM
2/21/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
2/9/2012
Motion to Compel
1/13/2012
ENTRY & ORDER
1/11/2012
Motion for increased child support & contempt for non-payment of current support order
1/11/2012
Order to Show Cause
1/11/2012
Notice of service of Defendant's First Set of Combined Discovery to Plaintiff
12/14/2011
Plaintiff's renewed Motion to impose sentence for contempt or compel Defendant to negotiate in good faith
12/13/2011
Plaintiff's renewed Motion to impose sentence for contempt or compel Defendant to negotiate in good faith
11/9/2011
ORDER
11/8/2011
Defendant's Memorandum Contra to Plaintiff's Motion
10/20/2011
Plaintiff's Motion to postpone Telephone Pretrial
10/20/2011
Plaintiff's Motion to postpone Telephone Pretrial, selection of vending machines for settlement and purging of Defendant's contempt
10/14/2011
Entry & Order Setting Telephone Pre-Trial