Case Information
10/3/2013
2007DR01440
Common Pleas
Timothy S Heys
Kathlene R Heys
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 22, 2013 @ 8:30 AM AND FULL DAY TRIAL ON NOV 26, 2013 @ 8:30 AM
Robert Harrelson
Docket History
6/29/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: ( AUGUST 20, 2012 @ 8:30 AM FOR A PRE TRIAL ) AND ( OCTOBER 16, 2012 @ 8:30 AM FOR FULL DAY TRIAL )
4/16/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days
2/15/2012
Motion to terminate shared parenting plan, determine tax exemption, health ins and Motion for child support
1/31/2012
Entry Granting Continuance
1/31/2012
Entry setting Mediation
1/20/2012
Order scheduling mediation
1/11/2012
Notice of substitution of Counsel for Defendant
1/9/2012
HEARING NOTICE
12/27/2011
Plaintiff's Motion to terminate Shared Parenting Plan or alternatively to modify Shared Parenting Plan
12/21/2011
Pre-Hearing Order
11/29/2011
Motion to modify Shared Parenting Plan
11/29/2011
Notice of Hearing on Dec 16