Docket History
6/13/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 22, 2013 @ 11:00 AM
5/22/2012
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS
4/25/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order
1/10/2012
Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Strike
1/6/2012
MOTION TO STRIKE
11/16/2011
NOTICE OF HEARING
11/4/2011
Notice of change of address
10/18/2011
Motion to withdraw as atty for Plaintiff
10/18/2011
Order GRANTING Motion to Withdraw