Docket History
5/1/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-7-25-13 @ 9:00AM
1/14/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 3/19/2013 AT 10:00AM
10/18/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 23, 2013 @ 9:00 AM FOR 2 HOURS
9/14/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 26, 2012 @ 9:00 AM
8/10/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCT 19, 2012 @ 10:00 AM
5/22/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order
5/21/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
2/10/2012
DECISION AND JUDGMENT
1/12/2012
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
12/2/2011
Motion and Notice of Hearing
12/2/2011
Motion for Continuance
12/2/2011
Entry GRANTING Continuance; continued to March 13, 2012