Docket History
8/5/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-9-11-14 @ 9:00AM
2/22/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-4-16-13 @ 1;30PM 1/2 DAY
12/14/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- FEB 22, 2013 @ 8:30 AM FOR 1/2 DAY
8/16/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: A SECOND PRETRIAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 18, 2012 @ 9:30 AM
5/24/2012
AGREED ORDER
5/23/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION
5/23/2012
PRE-HEARING ORDER
3/16/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
3/8/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION