ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 8, 2013 @ 9:00 AM FOR 1 FULL DAY AND CHILD INTERVIEW ON AUGUST 16, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
F. Ann Crossman
Docket History
3/5/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 29, 2013 @ 9:00 AM (FULL DAY) AND CHILD INTERVIEW AUGUST 1, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
11/29/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 08, 2013 @ 9:00 AM FOR 1 FULL DAY VACATE HEARING FOR CHILD INTERVIEW ON DEC 17, 2012 @ 3:30 PM RESET FOR MARCH 11, 2013 @ 2:30 PM
7/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- DEC 14, 2012 @ 9:00 AM & CHILD INTERVIEW ON DEC 17, 2012 @ 3:30 PM
5/7/2012
MOTION
5/1/2012
ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
2/28/2012
Entry Dismissing Motion For Want of Prosecution
2/10/2012
Entry and Order Adopting the Support Enforcement Agency’s Recommendation Regarding Default
2/9/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days