Docket History
5/5/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MAY 30, 2014 @ 3:00 PM
3/8/2012
Order To Holder To Release Lump Sum Funds
2/21/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days
12/27/2011
Motion for Continuance
12/27/2011
Entry of Continuance; continued to Feb 17, 2012
12/15/2011
Notice of appearance as Counsel
12/2/2011
Motion to appoint Special Process Server
12/2/2011
Order appointing Special Process Server
12/2/2011
Motion for Reallocation of Parental Rights and Responsibilities
12/2/2011
Notice of Hearing