Docket History
5/1/2020
DECISION
4/22/2020
ENTRY
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE
3/13/2020
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
RESPONDENT'S DUE APRIL 03, 2020 - MOVANT'S REPLY DUE BY APRIL 17, 2020
2/6/2020
DECISION
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND SETTING FOR HEARING ON MARCH 13, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/29/2020
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
10/31/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON DAMAGES ON DECEMBER 13, 2019 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 7
10/29/2019
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
8/6/2019
OTHER TORT