Case Information
11/18/2019
2019CV00698
Common Pleas
Montgomery County Treasurer
Betty L Nace
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON DECEMBER 19, 2019 AT 9:00 AM
Michele Phipps Pl
Docket History
8/14/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 14, 2019 AT 9:00 AM
5/9/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 14, 2019 AT 9:00 AM
4/1/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 08, 2019 AT 9:15 AM
2/12/2019
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE