ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DAMAGES FOR AUGUST 11, 2020 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM NO. 5 BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES
Anne Frayne
Docket History
1/31/2020
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DAMAGES FOR MARCH 04, 2020 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
1/7/2020
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DAMAGES ON JANUARY 30, 2020 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
8/16/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DAMAGES ON SEPTEMBER 27, 2019 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
6/7/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL D. SMITH AND DEFENDANT BRANDON SMITH ON JULY 02, 2019 AT 3:00 PM IN COURTROOM NO. 5