Case Information
5/19/2016
2016CV01886
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association As Indenture Trustee
Paul L Brown
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONSE REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
Fred Costello
Docket History
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONSE REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONSE REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
5/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONSE REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
5/5/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
5/5/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
5/5/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
4/11/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
4/11/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
4/11/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE