Docket History
5/23/2016
DECISION
ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2016 AT 900AM
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2016 AT 900AM
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2016 AT 900AM
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2016 AT 900AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
3/24/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/24/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE