Docket History
7/18/2019
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
7/12/2019
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY DELBERT THOMPSON
4/17/2019
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
ORDER REINSTATING CASE TO COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET
4/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/9/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/9/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/9/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE