Docket History
6/1/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/17/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/17/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/26/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/26/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/8/2016
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 1091623 Date: 03/08/2016
FILED BY DEFENDANT/EMPLOYER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL
3/8/2016
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 1091623 Date: 03/08/2016
FILED BY DEFENDANT/EMPLOYER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL
3/8/2016
WORKER COMPENSATION
3/8/2016
WORKER COMPENSATION
3/8/2016
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 1091623 Date: 03/08/2016
FILED BY DEFENDANT/EMPLOYER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL
3/8/2016
WORKER COMPENSATION
3/8/2016
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 1091623 Date: 03/08/2016
FILED BY DEFENDANT/EMPLOYER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL