Docket History
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 15, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 15, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 15, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
5/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ON MAY 11, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. BY TELEPHONE
5/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ON MAY 11, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. BY TELEPHONE
3/4/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
3/4/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
3/4/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER