Docket History
5/23/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/20/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO MAY 20, 2016
4/20/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO MAY 20, 2016
4/7/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
,
4/7/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
,
4/7/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
,
2/26/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
2/26/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
2/26/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER