Docket History
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/22/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
2/22/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
2/22/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE