Docket History
4/6/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1096251 Date: 04/06/2016
4/6/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1096251 Date: 04/06/2016
3/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0950
3/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0950
3/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0950
3/22/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0950
3/11/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/11/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/11/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/11/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
2/19/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
2/19/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
2/19/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY