Case Information
5/6/2016
2016CV00875
Common Pleas
Karl Casey
Susan Priest Richlak Special Administrator
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 845AM
Erin Burton
Docket History
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 845AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 845AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JUNE 28, 2016 AT 845AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 900AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 900AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 900AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 900AM
3/15/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
3/15/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
3/15/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
3/15/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT