Docket History
4/29/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1099782 Date: 04/29/2016
4/13/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/4/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/4/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/4/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/4/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
2/11/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON THURSDAY, MARCH 3, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
2/11/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON THURSDAY, MARCH 3, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
2/11/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON THURSDAY, MARCH 3, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
2/11/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON THURSDAY, MARCH 3, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
2/11/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
2/11/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY