Docket History
5/12/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
5/12/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
5/12/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
4/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
4/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
4/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 20, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 20, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 20, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 20, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
2/8/2016
PERSONAL INJURY
2/8/2016
PERSONAL INJURY
2/8/2016
PERSONAL INJURY