Docket History
5/6/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1100882 Date: 05/06/2016
5/6/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1100882 Date: 05/06/2016
5/6/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1100882 Date: 05/06/2016
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 845AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 845AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 845AM
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 5, 2016 AT 845AM
3/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0594
3/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0594
3/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0594
3/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0594
2/2/2016
PERSONAL INJURY
2/2/2016
PERSONAL INJURY