Docket History
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY Eric Pheneger
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY Eric Pheneger
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY Eric Pheneger
5/17/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/17/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
06/10/2016 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
5/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
06/10/2016 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
5/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
06/10/2016 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
5/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
06/10/2016 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
1/29/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
1/29/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE