Docket History
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 26, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M.
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 26, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M.
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 26, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M.
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCEON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M.
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCEON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M.
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCEON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M.
1/28/2016
APPROPRIATION
1/28/2016
APPROPRIATION