Docket History
4/22/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/22/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/22/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Wayne Novick
4/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Wayne Novick
4/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Wayne Novick
4/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Wayne Novick
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JACQUELINE WIRTZ
3/11/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
3/11/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
3/11/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
3/11/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
3/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/28/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
1/28/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE