Case Information
4/14/2016
2016CV00484
Common Pleas
Millburn Apartments Of Dayton Ii Ltd
Lloyd Penwell
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097639 Date: 04/14/2016
Laurence Lasky
Docket History
4/14/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097639 Date: 04/14/2016
4/14/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097639 Date: 04/14/2016
4/14/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097639 Date: 04/14/2016
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/24/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/3/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
AS TO LLOYD PENWELL
3/3/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
AS TO LLOYD PENWELL
3/3/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
AS TO LLOYD PENWELL
3/3/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
AS TO LLOYD PENWELL
1/27/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
1/27/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY