ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON APRIL 28, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 12, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 19, 2016.
Ellen Fornash
Docket History
4/29/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON APRIL 28, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 12, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 19, 2016.
3/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROCEED
3/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROCEED
3/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PROCEED