Docket History
4/29/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1099783 Date: 04/29/2016
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/20/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
02/12/2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/20/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
02/12/2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/20/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
02/12/2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/20/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
02/12/2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/20/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
1/20/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
1/20/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY