Case Information
5/23/2016
2016CV00313
Common Pleas
Montgomery County Treasurer
Princeton Commercial Holdings Llc
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 29, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
Lynne Nothstine
Docket History
5/23/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 29, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:40 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:40 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:40 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:40 AM
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 29, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 29, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 29, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
4/18/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE A VOID JUDGMENT
4/18/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE A VOID JUDGMENT
4/18/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE A VOID JUDGMENT
4/18/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE A VOID JUDGMENT
2/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/25/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.