Docket History
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097382 Date: 04/13/2016
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097382 Date: 04/13/2016
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Receipt: 1097382 Date: 04/13/2016
3/25/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/25/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/25/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
3/15/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/15/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/15/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/15/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/9/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
2/9/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
2/9/2016
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
1/14/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON 02-05-2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/14/2016
NOTICE: HEARING
ON 02-05-2016 FILED BY LAURENCE LASKY
1/14/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY
1/14/2016
FORCIBLE ENTRY