Case Information
5/24/2016
2016CV00230
Common Pleas
Tax Ease Ohio Llc
104 Investment Holdings Inc
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
JUNE 30, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
David Cliffe
Docket History
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
JUNE 30, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
JUNE 30, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
5/24/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
JUNE 30, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 24, 2016 AT 10:15 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 24, 2016 AT 10:15 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/19/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
MAY 24, 2016 AT 10:15 AM BY TELEPHONE
3/16/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
APRIL 19, 2016 AT 10:15 AM BY TELEPHONE
3/16/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
APRIL 19, 2016 AT 10:15 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:45 AM BY TELEPHONE
1/14/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
1/14/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE