Docket History
5/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE JUNE 24, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE JUNE 24, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
4/15/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
4/15/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
4/15/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
4/15/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 18, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 15, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 15, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 15, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 15, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
2/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MARCH 2, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
1/13/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
1/13/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE