Docket History
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 03, 2016
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 03, 2016
5/11/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 03, 2016
4/22/2016
DECISION
VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/22/2016
DECISION
VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/22/2016
DECISION
VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/22/2016
DECISION
VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/19/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 1098258 Date: 04/19/2016
4/19/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 1098258 Date: 04/19/2016
4/19/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 1098258 Date: 04/19/2016