Docket History
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 8, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 8, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE APRIL 8, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
2/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS FEBRUARY 26, 2016 AT 12:15 P.M.
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING IN CHAMBERS PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 09, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING IN CHAMBERS PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 09, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING IN CHAMBERS PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 09, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING IN CHAMBERS PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 09, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VAI TELEPHONE JANUARY 27, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE RESCHEDULED TO FEBRUARY 3, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VAI TELEPHONE JANUARY 27, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE RESCHEDULED TO FEBRUARY 3, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VAI TELEPHONE JANUARY 27, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE RESCHEDULED TO FEBRUARY 3, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VAI TELEPHONE JANUARY 27, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/20/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE RESCHEDULED TO FEBRUARY 3, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
12/8/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
12/8/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
12/8/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE