Case Information
5/6/2016
2015CV06338
Common Pleas
State Of Ohio Ex Rel Michael Dewine
Mary Talbert
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
Casey Chapman
Docket History
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 19, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
3/24/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON MAY 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO. 5
12/4/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER
12/4/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER