Docket History
5/6/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
5/6/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
5/6/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
5/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/4/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097392 Date: 04/13/2016
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097392 Date: 04/13/2016
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097392 Date: 04/13/2016
4/13/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 1097392 Date: 04/13/2016
4/1/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/1/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.