Case Information
4/1/2016
2015CV06268
Common Pleas
Debra Hawkins
Csaa General Insurance Company
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2016 AT 1:30 PM
Joseph Mondock
Docket History
4/1/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2016 AT 1:30 PM
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 2:15 PM
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 2:15 PM
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 2:15 PM
3/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 2:15 PM
1/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
1/14/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
12/1/2015
PERSONAL INJURY
12/1/2015
PERSONAL INJURY
12/1/2015
PERSONAL INJURY