ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
/ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1102858 Date: 05/20/2016
Joshua Debra
Docket History
5/20/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
/ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1102858 Date: 05/20/2016
5/20/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
/ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Receipt: 1102858 Date: 05/20/2016
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 11, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 25, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JUNE 01, 2016.
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 11, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 25, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JUNE 01, 2016.
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 11, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 25, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JUNE 01, 2016.
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 11, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 25, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JUNE 01, 2016.
4/27/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/27/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/27/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
4/27/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 13, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS